Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Sw Construction Enterprises, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Davagian, Ii, Esq., John S, against The Middlesex Corporation, Travelers Casualty And Surety Company Of America, represented by Ames, Jr., Esq., Rodney W, Kenney, Esq., Christopher A, Wecker, Esq., Ross C, Wernig, Esq., Joshua S, in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, MA, . Middlesex County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 25, 2016 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedJuly 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2018 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Final Pre-Trial Conference Sent On: 05/01/2018 12:39:22 | |
April 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Party(s) file Stipulation of Dismissal Pursuant to M.R.C.P. 41 (a)(1)(ii), Plaintiff and Defendant-in-Counterclaim, SW Construction Enterprises, LLC, upon stipulation of all parties, hereby dismisses with prejudice the above-captioned action in its entirety only as to both Defendants, The Middlesex Corporation and Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, without costs and waiving all rights of appeal. Pursuant to M.R.C.P. 41 (a)(1)(ii), Defendant and Plaintiff-in-Counterclaim, The Middlesex Corporation, and Defendant, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America upon stipulation of all parties, hereby dismisses with prejudice all counterclaims asserted against Defendant-in-Counterclaim, SW Construction Enterprises, LLC, in the above-captioned action, without costs and waiving all rights of appeal. Applies To: SW Construction Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff); The Middlesex Corporation (Defendant); Travelers Casualty And Surety Company of America (Defendant); Davagian, II, Esq., John S (Attorney) on behalf of SW Construction Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff); Kenney, Esq., Christopher A (Attorney) on behalf of Travelers Casualty And Surety Company of America (Defendant); Wecker, Esq., Ross C (Attorney) on behalf of Travelers Casualty And Surety Company of America (Defendant); Wernig, Esq., Joshua S (Attorney) on behalf of The Middlesex Corporation (Defendant); Ames, Jr., Esq., Rodney W (Attorney) on behalf of The Middlesex Corporation, Travelers Casualty And Surety Company of America (Defendant) | |
October 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Rodney W. Ames, Jr., Esq. added for Defendant Travelers Casualty And Surety Company of America | |
October 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Ross C. Wecker, Esq. added for Defendant Travelers Casualty And Surety Company of America | |
October 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Rodney W. Ames, Jr., Esq. added for Defendant The Middlesex Corporation | |
October 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Ross C. Wecker, Esq. added for Defendant The Middlesex Corporation | |
October 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Christopher A Kenney, Esq. added for Defendant Travelers Casualty And Surety Company of America | |
October 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Christopher A Kenney, Esq. added for Defendant The Middlesex Corporation | |
June 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Received from Defendant SW Construction Enterprises, LLC: Answer to the Counterclaim; | |
May 31, 2016 | Docket Event | Received from Defendant Travelers Casualty And Surety Company of America: Answer to original complaint; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.