Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Stallings, Zerrell T., filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Hampden County, MA, . Hampden County, MA Superior Courts Hampden County Probate and Family Court with Hyland, Hon. Barbara M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHyland, Hon. Barbara M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 21, 2021 |
CategoryGuardianship Managed |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationHampden County, MA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseHampden County Probate and Family Court |
Verified Motion for Appointment of Temporary Guardian/Conservator
Date: September 21, 2021Notarized Waiver and Consent to Petition for Guardian of Minor
Date: September 21, 2021Temporary Bond Approved of Temporary Guardian dated 09/21/2021, by Ellen Foley
Date: September 22, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Letters Issued. Letters of Authority (Guardianship of a Minor) Sent On: 11/29/2021 To: Stallings, Zerrell T. (Guardian) | |
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Permanent Bond Approved of Guardian dated 11/10/2021, by Theresa Cullinan Judge: Cullinan, Theresa | |
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Decree Appointing Guardian of Minor dated on 11/10/2021 Judge: Hyland, Hon. Barbara M Notified 11/29/2021: Stallings, Zerrell T. (Guardian)
Judge: Hyland, Barbara M |
|
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Event Resulted: Review Hearing scheduled on: 11/10/2021 10:00 AM Has been: Judgment/Decree Issued Hon. Barbara M Hyland, Presiding Appeared: Ward/Respondent Miracle Patrice Thomas Temporary Guardian Zerrell T. Stallings
Judge: Hyland, Barbara M |
|
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Bond Approved of Temporary Guardian dated 09/21/2021, by Ellen Foley | |
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Temporary Guardian Dated 09/21/2021 Notified 09/22/2021 | |
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appointment of Guardian of a Minor issued. Hearing date 11/10/2021 10:00 AM Review Hearing. | |
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Letters Issued. Letters of Authority (Guardianship of a Minor) Sent On: 09/22/2021 08:38:55 | |
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Bond Approved of Temporary Guardian dated 09/21/2021, by Ellen Foley | |
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Temporary Guardian Dated 09/21/2021 Notified 09/22/2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.