Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Griffith, Paul, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by D'Isola, Esq., Michael Mario, Glassman, Esq., Jeffrey S, Pro Se, against C&W Facility Services Inc., Lloyd, Darrell, represented by Darling, Esq., Mark A, Farrey Iii, Thomas B, Smith, Esq., Janet M, in the jurisdiction of Hampden County, MA, . Hampden County, MA Superior Courts with Mark D. Mason presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark D. Mason Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 22, 2021 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHampden County, MA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Plaintiff Paul Griffith's Motion to Vacated Dismissal
Date: August 28, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to vacate dismissal (#32.0): DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiff is to serve + file pursuant to Rule 9A (m. 8/30/23) | |
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Paul Griffith's Motion to Vacated Dismissal | |
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT 33(a) for Defendant(s), Darrell Lloyd against Plaintiff(s), Paul Griffith without statutory costs. | |
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Entered as to: Plaintiff Griffith, Paul: Defaulted pursuant to 33(a); | |
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Party status: Defendant Lloyd, Darrell: Dismissed; | |
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Entered as to: Defendant Lloyd, Darrell: Defaulted pursuant to 33(a); | |
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Rule 12 Hearing scheduled on: 09/21/2023 02:00 PM Has been: Canceled For the following reason: Case Disposed Hon. Mark D Mason, Presiding
Judge: Mason, Mark D |
|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Compliance with Exhibits A & B Applies To: Smith, Esq., Janet M (Attorney) on behalf of Lloyd, Darrell (Defendant) | |
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Application for entry of Final Judgment, Pursuant to Rule 33A Applies To: Lloyd, Darrell (Defendant) | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Rule 12 Hearing scheduled on: 07/17/2023 02:00 PM Has been: Held as Scheduled Hon. Mark D Mason, Presiding Staff: Nancy Ramos, Assistant Clerk Magistrate Alyson Yorlano, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Mason, Mark D |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.