Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Greenfield Country Estates Cooperative, Inc., filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, MA, . Franklin County, MA Superior Courts Franklin County Probate and Family Court with Sandman, Hon. Kathleen A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSandman, Hon. Kathleen A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2021 |
CategoryEstates And Administration |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationFranklin County, MA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseFranklin County Probate and Family Court |
Surviving Spouse, Children, Heirs at Law
Date: September 02, 2021Bond with Personal Sureties Applies To: Graves, Daniel F (Proposed Fiduciary)
Date: March 24, 2022Affidavit Of Patrick Tweed
Date: November 17, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Receipt and Release by David Ploskonka | |
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Receipt and Release by Dawn Holden | |
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Order 06/30/2023, Judge: Sandman, Hon. Kathleen A | |
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Event Resulted: Motion scheduled on: 06/13/2023 02:40 PM Has been: Order Issued Hon. Kathleen A Sandman, Presiding
Judge: Sandman, Kathleen A |
|
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Order 05/31/2023, Judge: Sandman, Hon. Kathleen A | |
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service | |
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit Of Heir | |
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order/Decree | |
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Amended Surviving Spouse, Children, Heirs at Law | |
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion To Reconsider and Vacate the Order of Decree as it Relates to the Determination of Heirs and subsequently Determine the Heirs of the Decedent |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.