Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Vibra Hospital Of W. Mass, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, MA, . Franklin County, MA Superior Courts Franklin County Probate and Family Court with Fidnick, Hon. Linda S presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFidnick, Hon. Linda S Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 04, 2021 |
CategoryGuardianship Managed |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationFranklin County, MA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseFranklin County Probate and Family Court |
Affidavit as to Military Service
Date: August 04, 2021Uniform Counsel Certification Form Filed by
Date: August 04, 2021Petition for Appointment of Guardian of Incapacitated Person
Date: August 04, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion To Dismiss ALLOWED on 05/17/2022 File Reference # 35 Judge: Fidnick, Hon. Linda S | |
May 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Scheduling Order 04/27/2022, Judge: Fidnick, Hon. Linda S | |
May 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Order After Pre Trial Conference dated 02/15/2022 Judge: Fidnick, Hon. Linda S | |
May 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion For Funds ALLOWED on 01/10/2022 File Reference # 32 Judge: Fidnick, Hon. Linda S | |
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Assented Motion To Dismiss Petition for Appointment of Guardian | |
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Joint Pre-Trial Conference Memorandum | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Withdrawal of Ex-Parte Motion for Funds for Retention of an Independent Clinician (Refers to Docket Entry #16) Applies To: Teran, Esq., Gregory P (Attorney) on behalf of Bartlett, Clifford (Ward/Respondent) | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Amended Ex-Parte Motion For Funds for Retention of an Independent Clinician Applies To: Teran, Esq., Gregory P (Attorney) on behalf of Bartlett, Clifford (Ward/Respondent) | |
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Order 11/03/2021, for Hearing Judge: Fidnick, Hon. Linda S | |
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of withdrawal of Motion for Temporary Guardianship/Treatment order and request for pretrial assignment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.