Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Pollard, Brian, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, MA, . Franklin County, MA Superior Courts Franklin County Probate and Family Court with Sandman, Hon. Kathleen A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSandman, Hon. Kathleen A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 08, 2021 |
CategoryEstates And Administration |
Last RefreshedSeptember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationFranklin County, MA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseFranklin County Probate and Family Court |
Surviving Spouse, Children, Heirs at Law
Date: June 09, 2021Affidavit as to Military Service
Date: June 08, 2021Return of Service on Notice of Informal Probate
Date: June 08, 2021Permanent Bond Without Sureties Filed
Date: June 08, 2021Petition for Informal Probate
Date: June 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Order for Informal Probate of Will and/or Appointment of Personal Representative dated 06/15/2021 Judge: Flanders, Alexa S | |
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Permanent Bond Approved of Personal Representative dated 06/15/2021, by Alexa S Flanders | |
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Letters Issued. Letters of Authority for Personal Representative Sent On: 06/16/2021 10:28:34 | |
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Brian Pollard Interested Person(s) , Filed Form MPC 455 to Assent and Waive Notice to an Informal Probate, Assent to the PR serving w/o sureties on bond, | |
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Surviving Spouse, Children, Heirs at Law | |
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Evan Pollard Interested Person(s) , Filed Form MPC 455 to Assent and Waive Notice to an Informal Probate, Assent to the PR serving w/o sureties on bond, | |
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit as to Military Service | |
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Kelly Pollard Interested Person(s) , Filed Form MPC 455 to Assent and Waive Notice to an Informal Probate, Assent to the PR serving w/o sureties on bond, | |
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Return of Service on Notice of Informal Probate | |
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Matthew Pollard Interested Person(s) , Filed Form MPC 455 to Assent and Waive Notice to an Informal Probate, Assent to the PR serving w/o sureties on bond, |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.