Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Croteau, Carrie, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, MA, . Franklin County, MA Superior Courts Franklin County Probate and Family Court with Sandman, Hon. Kathleen A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSandman, Hon. Kathleen A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 03, 2021 |
CategoryEstates And Administration |
Last RefreshedSeptember 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationFranklin County, MA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseFranklin County Probate and Family Court |
Petition for Formal Probate
Date: June 03, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Decree and Order of Formal Probate Judge: Flanders, Alexa S | |
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Permanent Bond Approved of Personal Representative dated 07/02/2021, by Alexa S Flanders | |
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Letters Issued. Letters of Authority for Personal Representative Sent On: 07/06/2021 09:06:19 | |
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Carrie Croteau Interested Person(s) , Filed Form MPC 455 to Assent and Waive Notice to Formal Probate, Assent to the PR serving w/o sureties on bond, | |
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Filed; Served as Ordered | |
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition for Formal Probate | |
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE: Citation on Petition for Formal Adjudication issued for unsupervised administration to be published in The Recorder Greenfield, MA. | |
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Surviving Spouse, Children, Heirs at Law | |
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Permanent Bond Without Sureties Filed | |
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Carrie Croteau Interested Person(s) , Filed Form MPC 455 to Assent and Waive Notice to Formal Probate, Assent to the PR serving w/o sureties on bond, Renounce my right as PR and nominate: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.