Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Makosiej, Melissa L., filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, MA, . Franklin County, MA Superior Courts Franklin County Probate and Family Court with Sandman, Hon. Kathleen A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSandman, Hon. Kathleen A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2021 |
CategoryEstates And Administration |
Last RefreshedAugust 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationFranklin County, MA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseFranklin County Probate and Family Court |
Petition for Formal Probate
Date: January 25, 2021Will- 5 pages
Date: January 25, 2021Codicil to Will-3 pages
Date: January 25, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Decree and Order of Formal Probate dated 03/02/2021 Judge: Crawford, Hon. Beth A | |
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Permanent Bond Approved of Personal Representative dated 03/02/2021, by Alexa S Flanders | |
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Letters Issued. Letters of Authority for Personal Representative Sent On: 03/03/2021 15:31:22 | |
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Amended Devisees | |
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Filed; Served as Ordered | |
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Amended Petition | |
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE: Citation on Petition for Formal Adjudication issued for unsupervised administration to be published in The Recorder. | |
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition for Formal Probate | |
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Will- 5 pages | |
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Codicil to Will-3 pages |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.