Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Bielski, Jerzy R, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Miller, Esq., John E, against Alber, Richard E, represented by Schranze, Esq., Bernard W, in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, MA, . Franklin County, MA Superior Courts with Mark D. Mason presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark D. Mason Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 17, 2021 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFranklin County, MA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with Prejudice, without Costs, all appellate rights waived as to Jerzy R Bielski's original complaint | |
October 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Jury Trial scheduled on: 11/28/2022 09:00 AM Has been: Canceled For the following reason: Case Settled Hon. Karen Goodwin, Presiding
Judge: Goodwin, Karen |
|
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Jerzy R Bielski's affidavit of written notice of intent to offer as evidence: medical bills pursuant to G.L. c.233, § 79G | |
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Final Pre-Trial Conference Sent On: 02/01/2022 09:04:34 | |
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Scheduled: Judge: Mason, Hon. Mark D Event: Jury Trial Date: 11/28/2022 Time: 09:00 AM Result: Canceled
Judge: Mason, Mark D |
|
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on: 01/28/2022 02:00 PM Has been: Held via Video/Teleconference Comments: The parties requested the date 11/14/22 at 2pm for a FPTC and 11/28/22 for JT. The Court Allowed the request. (Simanski, FTR, FC Ct Rm 4). Hon. Michael K Callan, Presiding
Judge: Callan, Michael K |
|
December 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Jerzy R Bielski's affidavit of written notice of intent to offer as evidence: medical bills pursuant to G.L. c.233, § 79G | |
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 11/29/2021 11:35:58 Notice Sent To: John E Miller, Esq. Law Offices of Attorney John E Miller 181 State St, Springfield, MA 01103 Notice Sent To: Bernard W Schranze, Esq. The Hanover Law Group 50 Resnik Rd Suite 201B, Plymouth, MA 02360 | |
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 11/29/2021 11:33:29 Notice Sent To: John E Miller, Esq. Law Offices of Attorney John E Miller 181 State St, Springfield, MA 01103 Notice Sent To: Bernard W Schranze, Esq. The Hanover Law Group 50 Resnik Rd Suite 201B, Plymouth, MA 02360 | |
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on: 03/07/2022 02:00 PM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: By Court prior to date Comments: No judge in February or March. Hon. Francis E Flannery, Presiding
Judge: Flannery, Francis E |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.