Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Rodriguez, Felix C, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Pro Se, against Bryant, Jess, Cahillane, Patrick, Garvey, Robert T, Jaquez, Eric, Jaquez, Jessica, (total of 10) See All in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, MA, . Franklin County, MA Superior Courts with Francis E. Flannery presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrancis E. Flannery Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 22, 2021 |
CategoryCivil Actions With Incarcerated Party |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationFranklin County, MA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Original civil complaint filed.
Date: April 22, 2021Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: April 22, 2021Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 04/22/2021
Date: April 22, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | other document, returned UNSERVED return to sender, no such number, unable to forward. Applies To: Garvey, Robert T (Defendant); Cahillane, Patrick (Defendant); Jaquez, Eric (Defendant); Jaquez, Jessica (Defendant); Martinez, Willy (Defendant); Martinez, Julie (Defendant); Myers, Kim (Defendant); Myers, Joshua (Defendant); Russ, Bryan (Defendant); Bryant, Jess (Defendant) | |
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on: 12/01/2021 02:00 PM Has been: Canceled For the following reason: Case Disposed Hon. Francis E Flannery, Presiding
Judge: Flannery, Francis E |
|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL (1-88) entered, service not completed for any party by deadline review. Applies To: Garvey, Robert T (Defendant); Cahillane, Patrick (Defendant); Jaquez, Eric (Defendant); Jaquez, Jessica (Defendant); Martinez, Willy (Defendant); Martinez, Julie (Defendant); Myers, Kim (Defendant); Myers, Joshua (Defendant); Russ, Bryan (Defendant); Bryant, Jess (Defendant); Event Judge: Flannery, Hon. Francis E | |
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Document: A Judgment of Dismissal 1-88 was generated and sent to: Plaintiff: Felix C Rodriguez Hartford Correctional Center #433178 177 Weston St, Hartford, CT 06120 Defendant: Robert T Garvey 511 Main St Suite 608, Springfield, MA 01102 Defendant: Patrick Cahillane 511 Main St Suite 608, Springfield, MA 01102 Defendant: Eric Jaquez 511 Main St Suite 608, Springfield, MA 01102 Defendant: Jessica Jaquez 511 Main St Suite 608, Springfield, MA 01102 Defendant: Willy Martinez 511 Main St Suite 608, Springfield, MA 01102 Defendant: Julie Martinez 511 Main St Suite 608, Springfield, MA 01102 Defendant: Kim Myers 511 Main St Suite 608, Springfield, MA 01102 Defendant: Joshua Myers 511 Main St Suite 608, Springfield, MA 01102 Defendant: Bryan Russ 511 Main St Suite 608, Springfield, MA 01102 Defendant: Jess Bryant 511 Main St Suite 608, Springfield, MA 01102 | |
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Original civil complaint filed. | |
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. | |
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 04/22/2021 | |
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Determination regarding normal fees and costs ALLOWED FORTHWITH by Clerk waived in full , pursuant to G. L. c. 261, § 27C(2). Applies To: Rodriguez, Felix C (Plaintiff) | |
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Supplement to affidavit of indigency Applies To: Rodriguez, Felix C (Plaintiff) | |
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Indigency and request for waiver substitution of state payment of fees and costs filed with Supplemental affidavit |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.