Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
The Commonwealth Of Massachusetts By David E Sullivan The District Attorney For The Northwestern District, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case represented by Bucci, Esq., Jeremy C, Rooke, Esq., Thomas John, against 12V Diesel Transfer Pump, 3 Mppt Solar Charge Controllers, Air Blower, Beleeb Battery Charger, Champion Global Power Equipment Generator, (total of 34) See All in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, MA, . Franklin County, MA Superior Courts with John A. Agostini presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn A. Agostini Track Judgeโs New Cases |
Filing DateApril 09, 2021 |
CategoryAdministrative Civil Actions |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationFranklin County, MA |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default. It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED:: Judgment for Plaintiff, defendants Sherri Jiang and Lan Ma defaulted under (Mass. R. Civ. P. 55(b)(1). Judge: Callan, Hon. Michael K | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Request for default (#12.0): ALLOWED Clerk allowed the default judgment on affidavit filed. No Motion filed. Applies To: Ma, Lan (Proposed Property Owner); Jiang, Sherri (Proposed Property Owner) | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Entered as to: Proposed Property Owner Ma, Lan: Defaulted by 55(a) request; | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Entered as to: Proposed Property Owner Jiang, Sherri: Defaulted by 55(a) request; | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Document: A Default order Mass. R. Civ. P. 55(a) was generated and sent to: Plaintiff, Attorney: Jeremy C Bucci, Esq. Northwestern District Attorney's Office 1 Gleason Plaza, Northampton, MA 01060 Proposed Property Owner: Lan Ma No addresses available | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Document: A Default order Mass. R. Civ. P. 55(a) was generated and sent to: Plaintiff, Attorney: Jeremy C Bucci, Esq. Northwestern District Attorney's Office 1 Gleason Plaza, Northampton, MA 01060 Proposed Property Owner: Sherri Jiang No addresses available | |
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Hearing on Forfeitures scheduled on: 08/24/2021 02:00 PM Has been: Held via Video/Teleconference Comments: The Court heard from the Commonwealth as to its request. After hearing, the Court ALLOWED the request. (Simanski, FTR, FC Ct Rm 4). Hon. John A Agostini, Presiding
Judge: Agostini, John A |
|
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | The Commonwealth of Massachusetts by David E Sullivan the District Attorney for the Northwestern District's request for Default 55(a) Applies To: Ma, Lan (Proposed Property Owner); Jiang, Sherri (Proposed Property Owner) | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit filed by Plaintiff The Commonwealth of Massachusetts by David E Sullivan the District Attorney for the Northwestern District in support of request for default. | |
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons, Short Order of Notice, returned SERVED Applies To: Ma, Lan (Proposed Property Owner); Jiang, Sherri (Proposed Property Owner) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.