Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Hulslander, Brett, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Connor, Esq., John Patrick, against Krauth, Diana, Krauth, Jeffrey B, Krauth Realty Management Llc, Vanguard Claims Administration For Lloyd'S London, represented by Farrey Iii, Thomas B, Flanagan, Esq., Christopher P, Seliger, Esq., Brooke, Tierney, Esq., Kevin M, in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, MA, . Franklin County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 28, 2016 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFranklin County, MA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Service Returned for Defendant Krauth, Jeffrey B: Service made in hand;
Date: December 23, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 05, 2017 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with Prejudice, without Costs as to Brett Hulslander's original complaint Applies To: Krauth, Jeffrey B (Defendant); Krauth, Diana (Defendant); Krauth Realty Management LLC (Defendant); Vanguard Claims Administration for Lloyd's London (Defendant) | |
June 05, 2017 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 09/19/2017 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Canceled Reason: Case Settled | |
April 26, 2017 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 04/26/2017 10:51:01 | |
February 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Summons, returned SERVED On 12/07/16 by certified mail, return receipt requested. See attached copy of card. Applies To: Vanguard Claims Administration for Lloyd's London (Defendant) | |
February 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 09/06/2017 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Canceled Reason: By Court prior to date | |
January 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to sever and stay an action plaintiff's chapter 93A and 176D claims pending resolution of the underlying tort claim (#11.0): ALLOWED without opposition. | |
January 30, 2017 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance with Superior Court Rule 9A Applies To: Seliger, Esq., Brooke (Attorney) on behalf of Vanguard Claims Administration for Lloyd's London (Defendant); Farrey III, Thomas B (Attorney) on behalf of Vanguard Claims Administration for Lloyd's London (Defendant) | |
January 30, 2017 | Docket Event | Vanguard Claims Administration for Lloyd's London's Memorandum in support of motion to sever and stay plaintiff's Chapter 93A and 176D claims pending resolution of the underlying tort claim | |
January 30, 2017 | Docket Event | Rule 9A notice of filing | |
January 30, 2017 | Docket Event | Rule 9A list of documents filed. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.