Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Lakota, Jr., Stanley J, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Pro Se, against Smith, M.D., Robert, represented by Fennell, Esq., William J, in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, MA, . Franklin County, MA Superior Courts with Ferrara, John presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFerrara, John Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 27, 2016 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedJuly 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFranklin County, MA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT: Failure to prosecute and appear for 03/15/2018 02:00 PM Malpractice Tribunal, complaint of Stanley J Lakota, Jr. is dismissed without prejudice. Judge: Ferrara, Hon. John S
Judge: Ferrara, John |
|
March 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice to Board of Registration in Medicine of Disposition. | |
March 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Event Result: Judge: Mason, Hon. Mark D The following event: Malpractice Tribunal scheduled for 03/15/2018 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Not Held Reason: Plaintiff/Petitioner failed to appear
Judge: Mason, Mark D |
|
March 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
The medical malpractice tribunal made up of Hon. John S Ferrara, George Abraham, M.D. and John T Liebel, Esq., having met on 03/15/2018 02:00 PM Malpractice Tribunal reports that there is not sufficient evidence to raise a legitimate question as to liability appropriate for judicial inquiry. Plaintiff failed to appear and did not serve or file an Offer of Proof. See endorsement on Plaintiff's Motion to Continue of 1/19/17. Action dismissed for non-prosecution. Judge: Ferrara, Hon. John S Applies To: Smith, M.D., Robert (Defendant)
Judge: Ferrara, John S |
|
November 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER for medical malpractice tribunal for General Surgeon, in reference to Stanley J Lakota, Jr. with Hon. David Ricciardone presiding, George Abraham, M.D., 123 Summer St., Suite 385, Worcester, MA 01608 and John T Liebel, Esq. Judge: Ricciardone, Hon. David
Judge: Ricciardone, DavidRicciardone, David |
|
January 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion to continue / reschedule an event Medical Tribunal (#10.0): ALLOWED and this matter is continued for another tribunal hearing NOT SOONER than 60 days from this date. Plaintiff is notified that though he is pro se, (representing himself) he must comply with the Rule of Civil Procedure, Superior Court Rules, and applicable statues. He must also understand that he is required to serve any documents (such as this Motion) on counsel for Dr. Smith. He would be wise to get an attorney. Judge: Ferrara, Hon. John S
Judge: Ferrara, John |
|
January 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff Stanley J Lakota, Jr.'s EMERGENCY Motion to continue / reschedule an event Medical Tribunal Judge: Ferrara, Hon. John S
Judge: Ferrara, John |
|
January 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER for medical malpractice tribunal for General Surgeon, in reference to Stanley J Lakota, Jr. with Hon. John S Ferrara presiding, Peter R. Chair, MD 9 Ithaca Circle, Newton, MA 02462 and David Michael Hodge, Esq. Judge: Ferrara, Hon. John S
Judge: Ferrara, JohnFerrara, John S |
|
October 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
General correspondence regarding Certified copy of Docket Report from Hampden County Judge: Ferrara, Hon. John S
Judge: Ferrara, John |
|
September 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Smith, M.D., Robert: Service through person in charge / agent; on 09/08/16 in hand to Frates Suped an attested copy of the summons, complaint and civil tracking order. Original summons returned unserved. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.