Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Mota Ledesma, Daysi E., filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Essex County, MA, . Essex County, MA Superior Courts Essex County Probate and Family Court with Giordano, Hon. Frances M. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGiordano, Hon. Frances M. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2021 |
CategoryGuardianship Managed |
Last RefreshedNovember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationEssex County, MA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseEssex County Probate and Family Court |
Affidavit Disclosing Care and Custody
Date: September 02, 2021Emergency Motion For Temporary Guardianship
Date: September 02, 2021Affidavit In Support of Emergency Motion
Date: September 02, 2021Notarized and Verified Consent or Nomination by Minor
Date: September 02, 2021Verified Motion For Appointment of Temporary Guardianship
Date: September 02, 2021Temporary Bond Without Sureties Filed
Date: September 02, 2021Affidavit Of DCF Involvement
Date: September 02, 2021Affidavit Of Public Assistance
Date: September 02, 2021Petition for Appointment of Guardian of Minor
Date: September 02, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Judgment of Dismissal 11/30/2021 Judge: Ross, Hon. Abbe L | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion For Temp Guardianship/Conservator DENIED on 09/02/2021 File Reference # 8 | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit Disclosing Care and Custody | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Emergency Motion For Temporary Guardianship | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit In Support of Emergency Motion | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit In Support of Emergency Motion | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Emergency Motion For Temporary Guardianship | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Notarized and Verified Consent or Nomination by Minor | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Verified Motion For Appointment of Temporary Guardianship | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Bond Without Sureties Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.