Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Guerrero, Rafael, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Pingeton, Esq., Matthew Augustus, against Estate Of Elizabeth Fallisi, Fallisi, Elizabeth, Gomez, Felix, The Commerce Insurance Company, represented by Clancy, Esq., George E, Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Essex County, MA, . Essex County, MA Superior Courts with Kathleen M. McCarthy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKathleen M. McCarthy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedOctober 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationEssex County, MA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Original civil complaint filed.
Date: September 07, 2021Service Returned for Defendant Gomez, Felix: Service made at last and usual
Date: November 19, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of voluntary dismissal (41a.l.i) | |
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Docket Note: File sent to Salem Superior Court | |
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Conference to Review Status scheduled on: 01/18/2022 02:00 PM Has been: Held via Video/Teleconference Comments: Defendant Felix Gomez did not appear. After discussion with Plaintiff's counsel, matter will not be rescheduled at this time, as Plaintiff's counsel expects to be filing further papers on this matter that may resolve case. Hon. Kathleen McCarthy-Neyman, Presiding Staff: Stefano J Cornelio, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: McCarthy-Neyman, Kathleen |
|
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Case file images: Notice to Appear for Conference to Review Status (1/18/22)[BY ZOOM] | |
December 27, 2021 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 12/27/2021 15:53:33 | |
December 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion of Nina E. Kallen to withdraw as counsel for defendant Felix Gomez (#6.0): ALLOWED A status conference will be scheduled to address the counsel issue with the defendant (i.e, to explain his need to retain counsel or to proceed prose). Dated 12/17/21. | |
December 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Pro Se added for Defendant Felix Gomez | |
December 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Nina Elizabeth Kallen, Esq. dismissed/withdrawn for Defendant Felix Gomez | |
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance with Superior Court Rule 9A Applies To: Kallen, Esq., Nina Elizabeth (Attorney) on behalf of Gomez, Felix (Defendant) | |
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Rule 9A notice of filing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.