Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Moehnke, Emily J., filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Dukes County, MA, . Dukes County, MA Superior Courts Dukes County Probate and Family Court with Gorman, Hon. Patricia presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGorman, Hon. Patricia Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 25, 2021 |
CategoryEstates And Administration |
Last RefreshedSeptember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationDukes County, MA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseDukes County Probate and Family Court |
Petition for Formal Probate Judge: Jacobs, Hon. Susan L
Date: August 25, 2021Permanent Bond Without Sureties Filed
Date: August 25, 2021Will
Date: August 25, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Letters Issued. Letters of Authority for Personal Representative Sent On: 01/30/2023 11:11:55 | |
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Decree and Order of Formal Probate ENTERED 09/28/21 Judge: Gorman, Hon. Patricia
Judge: Gorman, Patricia |
|
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Permanent Bond Approved of Personal Representative dated 09/28/2021, by Hon. Patricia Gorman | |
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Letters Issued. Letters of Authority for Personal Representative Sent On: 09/29/2021 11:54:12 | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Filed; Served as Ordered | |
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion To Waive GAL ALLOWED on 09/08/2021 File Reference # 9 Judge: Jacobs, Hon. Susan L | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition for Formal Probate Judge: Jacobs, Hon. Susan L | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Permanent Bond Without Sureties Filed | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Will | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Surviving Spouse, Children, Heirs at Law |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.