Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Kenney, Diane E., filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Dukes County, MA, . Dukes County, MA Superior Courts Dukes County Probate and Family Court with Gorman, Hon. Patricia presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGorman, Hon. Patricia Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 26, 2021 |
CategoryEstates And Administration |
Last RefreshedJuly 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationDukes County, MA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseDukes County Probate and Family Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment/Decree on Complete Settlement filed 5/25/23 entered on 05/25/2023 Related to File Reference # 17 - Daphne DeVries, MUPC Magistrate | |
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Interested Person(s) , Filed Form MPC 455 to Assent/Waive Notice to Ptn for Complete Settlement, , | |
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Shelby Lynn Aikens Interested Person(s) , Filed Form MPC 455 to Assent/Waive Notice to Ptn for Complete Settlement, , | |
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Personal Representative's First and Final Account | |
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Petition for Order of Complete Settlement | |
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Inventory Filed | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion To Waive GAL ALLOWED on 08/24/2021 File Reference # 8 Judge: Gorman, Hon. Patricia
Judge: Gorman, Patricia |
|
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Decree and Order of Formal Probate - entered 8/24/21 Judge: Gorman, Hon. Patricia
Judge: Gorman, Patricia |
|
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Permanent Bond Approved of Personal Representative dated 08/24/2021, by Daphne DeVries | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Letters Issued. Letters of Authority for Personal Representative Sent On: 08/25/2021 14:47:17 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.