Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Beebe, Christopher, Brandt, Thomas F., filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Dukes County, MA, . Dukes County, MA Superior Courts Dukes County Probate and Family Court with Gorman, Hon. Patricia presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGorman, Hon. Patricia Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 01, 2021 |
CategoryEstates And Administration |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationDukes County, MA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseDukes County Probate and Family Court |
Devisees
Date: July 02, 2021Petition for Formal Probate Judge: Jacobs, Hon. Susan L
Date: July 02, 2021Will
Date: July 02, 2021Affidavit as to Military Service
Date: July 02, 2021Permanent Bond With Personal Sureties Filed
Date: July 02, 2021Uniform Counsel Certification Form Filed by Attorney G. Barao
Date: July 02, 2021Surviving Spouse, Children, Heirs at Law
Date: July 02, 2021Citation Filed; Served as Ordered
Date: July 28, 2021Permanent Bond Approved of Trustee dated 08/26/2021, by Daphne DeVries MUPC Magistrate
Date: August 26, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Closing Statement Applies To: Barao, Esq., Margaret Germaine (Attorney) on behalf of Beebe, Christopher (Personal Representative) | |
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Permanent Bond Without Sureties Filed Applies To: Barao, Esq., Margaret Germaine (Attorney) on behalf of Beebe, Christopher (Personal Representative) | |
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Statement of Confirmation of Testamentary Trustee Applies To: Barao, Esq., Margaret Germaine (Attorney) on behalf of Beebe, Christopher (Personal Representative) | |
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Permanent Bond Approved of Trustee dated 08/26/2021, by Daphne DeVries MUPC Magistrate | |
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Permanent Bond Approved of Personal Representative dated 07/28/2021, by Hon. Patricia Gorman | |
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Decree and Order of Formal Probate ENTERED 7/28/2021 Judge: Gorman, Hon. Patricia
Judge: Gorman, Patricia |
|
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Letters Issued. Letters of Authority for Personal Representative Sent On: 07/29/2021 14:18:06 | |
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Filed; Served as Ordered | |
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Event Resulted: Review Hearing scheduled on: 07/27/2021 03:00 PM Has been: Judgment/Decree Issued Hon. Patricia Gorman, Presiding
Judge: Gorman, Patricia |
|
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Devisees |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.