Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Reade Kontje Milne, Zoning Officer For The Town Of Edgartown, filed a(n) Equitable Remedies case represented by Goldsmith, Esq., Michael A, against Chambers, Christopher R., represented by Carter, Esq., Nicholas B, O'Brien, Esq., Rebecca Morgan, in the jurisdiction of Dukes County, MA, . Dukes County, MA Superior Courts with Mark C. Gildea presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark C. Gildea Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 12, 2021 |
CategoryEquitable Remedies |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDukes County, MA |
|
Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: April 12, 2021Opposition to paper # 12 filed by Christopher R. Chambers e-filed
Date: July 06, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Chambers, Christopher R.: Copy of Order for Preliminary Injunction, Service made in hand, by Deputy Sheriff, Kelli Stewart, Dukes County Sheriff's Office. | |
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Preliminary Injunction issued for Plaintiff Reade Kontje Milne, Zoning Officer for the Town of Edgartown. It is ordered and adjudged that Defendant(s) Christopher R. Chambers and their various attorneys and agents are: After hearing, and upon consideration of the parties' submissions, the court finds that there is a likelihood of success on the merits of the Zoning Officer's claims and that the requested relief promotes the public interest. A preliminary injunction shall issue as follows: 1. Defendant, Christopher Chambers, shall, within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, remove all vehicles (whether registered or unregistered, including any box trucks), boats, campers, port-a-potties, and building materials, from the properties known as 1, 5, and 9 Holly Bear Lane, Edgartown. 2. This Order precludes defendant, Christopher Chambers, and anyone acting on his behalf, from bringing such items and materials back onto the properties after any removal unless and until Mr. Chambers receives any required zoning approval which would allow such items and materials to be maintained on the properties. | |
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (#12.0): ALLOWED After hearing, and upon consideration of the parties' submissions, the court finds that there is a likelihood of success on the merits of the Zoning Officer's claims and that the requested relief promotes the public interest. A preliminary injunction shall issue as follows: 1. Defendant, Christopher Chambers, shall, within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, remove all vehicles (whether registered or unregistered, including any box trucks), boats, campers, port-a-potties, and building materials, from the properties known as 1, 5, and 9 Holly Bear Lane, Edgartown. 2. This Order precludes defendant, Christopher Chambers, and anyone acting on his behalf, from bringing such items and materials back onto the properties after any removal unless and until Mr. Chambers receives any required zoning approval which would allow such items and materials to be maintained on the properties. Judge: Gildea, Hon. Mark
Judge: Gildea, Mark |
|
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance electronically filed. Applies To: Carter, Esq., Nicholas B (Attorney) on behalf of Chambers, Christopher R. (Defendant) | |
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiff(s) Reade Kontje Milne, Zoning Officer for the Town of Edgartown's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction | |
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Event Result: Status Review scheduled on: 07/07/2021 10:45 AM Has been: Held as Scheduled Hon. Mark Gildea, Presiding
Judge: Gildea, Mark |
|
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Opposition to paper # 12 filed by Christopher R. Chambers e-filed | |
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit e-filed | |
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 06/30/2021 08:44:33 Notice Sent To: Michael A Goldsmith, Esq. Reynolds, Rappaport, Kaplan and Hackney, L.L.C. 106 Cooke St PO Box 2540, Edgartown, MA 02539 Notice Sent To: Nicholas B Carter, Esq. Todd and Weld LLP One Federal St, Boston, MA 02110 | |
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Status Review scheduled on: 06/29/2021 11:00 AM Has been: Held via Video/Teleconference Hon. Mark Gildea, Presiding
Judge: Gildea, Mark |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.