Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Westwood One Construction, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Gillis, Esq., Michael K, Rogers, Esq., Joseph I, against Ascoli, Rebecca, Ascoli, Robert, Source Real Estate, Llc, represented by Vukota, Esq., Marilyn H, in the jurisdiction of Dukes County, MA, . Dukes County, MA Superior Courts with Elaine M. Buckley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElaine M. Buckley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 12, 2021 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedOctober 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationDukes County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER: Scheduling Order | |
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Scheduled: Event: Jury Trial Date: 04/25/2024 Time: 09:30 AM | |
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Joseph I Rogers, Esq. added for Plaintiff Westwood One Construction, Inc. | |
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on: 08/02/2023 02:15 PM Has been: Held as Scheduled Hon. Elaine M Buckley, Presiding
Judge: Buckley, Elaine M |
|
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance electronically filed. | |
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Joint Pre-Trial Memorandum filed: | |
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Michael K Gillis, Esq., Marilyn H Vukota, Esq.'s Joint Memorandum Pre-Trial | |
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiff, Defendant in a Counterclaim Westwood One Construction, Inc.'s Assented to Motion to Conduct Final Pre-Trial Conference Via Zoom | |
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to Conduct Final Pre-Trial Conference Via Zoom (#9.0): ALLOWED 7/28/23 - Motion is Allowed so long as the parties submit a complete Joint Pre-Trial Memorandum to the court by 4:00 p.m. on 7/31/23. Should the parties fail to submit the memorandum as ordered, the court will require an in-person hearing for all parties. Hon. Elaine Buckley, J. (by. T. George Davis, Clerk) | |
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Received from Plaintiff Westwood One Construction, Inc.: Answer to the Counterclaim with Jury Demand |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.