Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Camara, Brandon, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts Bristol County Probate and Family Court with McMahon, Hon. Richard J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcMahon, Hon. Richard J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
CategoryEstates And Administration |
Last RefreshedSeptember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationBristol County, MA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseBristol County Probate and Family Court |
Affidavit In support of Motion for Special PR Applies To: Camara, Brandon (Petitioner)
Date: September 03, 2021Additional Bond Without Sureties Filed
Date: September 03, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Claim - DOR | |
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Release of All Demands and Assent to Account by State Road Auto Sales | |
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Release of All Demands and Assent to Account Coastal Legal Affiliates, P.C. | |
June 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Decree on Sale of Real Estate DATED 6/7/2022 Judge: Field, Hon. Katherine A | |
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Interested Person(s) , Filed Form MPC 455 to Assent/Waive Notice to Sale of Real Estate, , by Brandon Camara | |
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Inventory Filed (personal estate: $16500.00 real estate: $400,000.00) | |
May 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Petition for Sale of Real Estate | |
May 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit Of FIling of Notice with the Registry of Deeds | |
May 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Interested Person(s) , Filed Form MPC 455 to Assent/Waive Notice to Sale of Real Estate, , by Austin Camara | |
May 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Interested Person(s) , Filed Form MPC 455 to Assent/Waive Notice to Sale of Real Estate, , by Victoria Camara |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.