Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Compton, Theresa D, filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case represented by Ishihara, Esq., Margaret A, against Smith, Eli, University Of Massachusetts Dartmouth, represented by Hoven, Esq., Michael Barry, in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts with Thomas F. Brownell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas F. Brownell Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 31, 2021 |
CategoryActions Involving The State/Municipality |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBristol County, MA |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
Case assigned to: DCM Track A - Average was added on 09/01/2021
Date: September 01, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion to extend discovery deadline (#21.0): ALLOWED amending the discovery deadline until January 19, 2024 and all tracking deadlines Judge: Cloutier, Hon. Claudine
Judge: Cloutier, Claudine |
|
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Defendant University of Massachusetts Dartmouth's Assented to Motion to extend tracking deadline(s) | |
November 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to extend tracking deadline(s) (#20.0): No Action Taken as there is no signed assent of opposing Counsel. Judge: Milord, Kellee-Sue | |
November 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Defendant University of Massachusetts Dartmouth's Assented to Motion to extend tracking deadline(s) | |
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Theresa D Compton's Notice of Vacation of Plaintiff's Counsel | |
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to extend discovery (#18.0): ALLOWED by agreement. | |
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Theresa D Compton's Joint Motion to extend tracking deadline(s) | |
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for assessment of damages and default judgment (#17.0): Other action taken Plaintiff's motion for assessment of damages against the defendant, Eli Smith shall be heard when the claim against the co-defendant, University of Massachusetts, is resolved or sooner on request of the plaintiff. Judge: McGuire, Jr., Hon. Thomas F | |
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Theresa D Compton's Motion for an Assessment of Damages and Default Judgment | |
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Default (1-88): Defendant Smith, Eli: Defaulted under time standards Applies To: Smith, Eli (Defendant) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.