Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Voshell, Katherine, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Delello, Esq., Robert A, Jones, Esq., Patrick T, against 20Th Real Estate Management, Inc, Martinj, Llc, represented by Lee, Esq., Jay V, Lynch, Iii, Esq., Francis John, Mcnaught, Esq., Andrew D, Murphy, Esq., Thomas, in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2021 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedOctober 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBristol County, MA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Complaint electronically filed.
Date: August 31, 2021Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 08/31/2021
Date: August 31, 2021Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: August 31, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to extend tracking order (#17.0): ALLOWED Tracking order to be amended adopting the dates proposed therein. Judge: Yessayan, Hon. Raffi N | |
September 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Robert A DeLello, Esq. added for Plaintiff Katherine Voshell Administrator of the Estate of Eric L Voshell | |
September 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Defendant Martinj, LLC doing business as JC's Cafe' & Restaurant's Joint Motion to extend tracking deadline(s) | |
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date John A Eklund, Esq. dismissed/withdrawn as Private Counsel for Defendant Martinj, LLC doing business as JC's Cafe' & Restaurant | |
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance electronically filed. | |
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance electronically filed. | |
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Francis John Lynch, III, Esq. added for Defendant Martinj, LLC doing business as JC's Cafe' & Restaurant | |
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer with a crossclaim and jury demand of the Defendant, 20th Real Estate Management, INC., to the complaint of the Plaintiff | |
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion of defendant, 20th Real Estate Management, Inc. to dismiss counts VI, VII, VIII and X of the plaintiff's complaint (#13.0): ALLOWED There being no opposition, motion Allowed. Judge: Sullivan, Hon. Susan E | |
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Compliance Superior Court Rule 9A Applies To: McNaught, Esq., Andrew D (Attorney) on behalf of 20th Real Estate Management, Inc (Defendant) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.