Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Douglas, Jerome, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Lang, Esq., Ryan D, against Poitras, Shane, in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2021 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedOctober 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBristol County, MA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: August 31, 2021Original civil complaint filed.
Date: August 31, 2021Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 08/30/2021
Date: August 31, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Note: Secretary for Attorney Ryan Lang called stating they had not received the summonses ordered on 10/14/2021. 4 summonses mailed this day | |
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Judgment of dismissal pursuant to S.J.C. "Order Regarding Amount in Controversy", no hearing. Judge: Dupuis, Hon. Renee P | |
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. (Amended) Applies To: Douglas, Jerome (Plaintiff) | |
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | One Trial entry of dismissal nisi S.J.C. "Order Regarding Amount in Controversy". Judge: Yessayan, Hon. Raffi N | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | One Trial case reviewed by Judge jurisdictional nisi order to issue. Judge: Yessayan, Hon. Raffi N | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Demand for jury trial entered. | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Original civil complaint filed. | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 08/30/2021 | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Ryan D Lang, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Plaintiff Jerome Douglas |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.