Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Labelle, Alicia V, Licciardi, John A, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Flaherty, Esq., Thomas J, against Rkl Financial Corporation, represented by Cormier, Esq., Melanie C, Curran, Jr., Esq., Patrick M, in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts with William M. White, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam M. White, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 22, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBristol County, MA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: July 22, 2021Agreement for Judgment: Judge: White, Jr., Hon. William M
Date: September 20, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiffs Alicia V Labelle, John A Licciardi's Certificate of Judgment. Sent to Atty. Flaherty on 10/6/2021. | |
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiffs Alicia V Labelle, John A Licciardi's Request for a Certificate of Judgment. | |
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Agreement for Judgment: Judge: White, Jr., Hon. William M | |
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for Entry of Stipulated Consent Judgment and Declaratory Relief (#7.0): No Action Taken See paper #8. (Garrett R. Fregault, Assistant Clerk/Magistrate) | |
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiffs Alicia V Labelle, John A Licciardi's Joint Motion for Entry of Stipulated Consent Judgment and Declaratory Relief | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for extension of time to respond to plaintiff's complaint (#3.0): ALLOWED by assent Judge: Sullivan, Jennifer A | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Corporate Disclosure Statement filed Applies To: RKL Financial Corporation Formerly Known As SLM Financial Corporation (Defendant) | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Patrick M Curran, Jr., Esq. added as Private Counsel for Defendant RKL Financial Corporation Formerly Known As SLM Financial Corporation | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant RKL Financial Corporation Formerly Known As SLM Financial Corporation: Service via certified mail; | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant RKL Financial Corporation Formerly Known As SLM Financial Corporation's Assented to Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.