Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Richard, Christy, filed a(n) Equitable Remedies case represented by Gagliardi, Esq., Mark P, against Attuck, Llc, Trustee Of The Harrison Trust U D T Dated September 7, 2005, in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts with William M. White, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam M. White, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 20, 2021 |
CategoryEquitable Remedies |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBristol County, MA |
|
Complaint electronically filed.
Date: July 20, 2021Amended: amended complaint filed by Christy Richard
Date: July 22, 2021Affidavit of Christy Richard
Date: July 22, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Party(s) file Stipulation of Dismissal Now come the parties in the above-captioned matter, by and through their respective attorneys, pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) of the Massachusetts Rules of Civil Procedure and hereby agree that this matter shall be dismissed with prejudice and that each party shall bear they own attorneys' fees and costs Applies To: Richard, Christy (Plaintiff); Attuck, LLC, Trustee of the Harrison Trust u/d/t dated September 7, 2005 Trustee of Colken Townhouse Condominium Trust u/d/t dated October 4, 2006 (Defendant) | |
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Party(s) file Stipulation for Service. Applies To: Attuck, LLC, Trustee of the Harrison Trust u/d/t dated September 7, 2005 Trustee of Colken Townhouse Condominium Trust u/d/t dated October 4, 2006 (Defendant) | |
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Attuck, LLC, Trustee of the Harrison Trust u/d/t dated September 7, 2005 Trustee of Colken Townhouse Condominium Trust u/d/t dated October 4, 2006: Service accepted by counsel; | |
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Case sent to Bristol County - TAUNTON Location. | |
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Event Result:: Hearing on Preliminary Injunction scheduled on: 08/12/2021 10:00 AM Has been: Not Held For the following reason: Request of Plaintiff Comments: Motion withdrawn by counsel Hon. William M White, Jr., Presiding Staff: Dina Swanson, Assistant Clerk Magistrate Digital Recording Device Bris CV B, Court Reporter | |
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons and order of notice issued on a Complaint for a Preliminary Injunction , returnable on 08/12/2021 10:00 AM Hearing on Preliminary Injunction. Judge: White, Jr., Hon. William M | |
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Amended: amended complaint filed by Christy Richard | |
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Christy Richard | |
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint electronically filed. | |
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.