Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Hancock Importing Co. Llc, Hancock Importing Co., Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Garabedian, Esq., Stephen, against Boyles, Jr., Dale, Lanterna Distributors Inc., in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts with Raffi N. Yessayan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRaffi N. Yessayan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 16, 2021 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBristol County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Complaint electronically filed.
Date: June 16, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of voluntary dismissal (41a.l.i) | |
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Hancock Importing Co., LLC Formerly Known As Vision Wine & Spirits, LLC's Notice of Discharge of the Trustee | |
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons, returned SERVED Applies To: Truist Bank doing business as Branch Banking & Trust Company (Trustee Defendant) | |
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to Approve the Stipulation to Release Funds (#8.0): ALLOWED Judge: Yessayan, Hon. Raffi N | |
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Hancock Importing Co., LLC Formerly Known As Vision Wine & Spirits, LLC's Joint Motion to Approve the Stipulation to Release Funds | |
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Received from Trustee Defendant Truist Bank doing business as Branch Banking & Trust Company: Answer to Trustee Summons | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for Trustee Process (#5.0): ALLOWED I find a reasonable likelihood the plaintiff will recover judgment in an amount equal to or greater than $80,160.61, there is no liability insurance available to cover a judgment, and there is a clear danger that, if notified in advance of the attachment on trustee process defendants will dissipate the credits. Motion is ALLOWED in the amount requested and for successive service as requested. Judge: Sullivan, Hon. Susan E | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Findings and Order for Approval of Plaintiff(s) Hancock Importing Co., LLC Formerly Known As Vision Wine & Spirits, LLC's Motion (#5.0) for Trustee Process as to Defendant(s) Lanterna Distributors Inc., Dale Boyles, Jr. Also Known As Dale E Boyles, Jr. in the hands of Truist Bank doing business as Branch Banking & Trust Company in the amount of $80,160.61 . | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 06/17/2021 | |
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint electronically filed. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.