Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Medina, Emily, filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts with Susan E. Sullivan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSusan E. Sullivan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 09, 2021 |
CategoryMiscellaneous Civil Actions |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBristol County, MA |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
Petitioner Emily Medina's Motion to dismiss all counts
Date: June 16, 2021Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: June 09, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Hearing - Habeas Corpus scheduled on: 06/18/2021 11:00 AM Has been: Canceled For the following reason: Case Disposed Hon. Susan E Sullivan, Presiding Staff: Jennifer A Sullivan, Assistant Clerk Magistrate Digital Recording Device Bris CV A, Court Reporter
Judge: Sullivan, Susan E |
|
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to dismiss (#6.0): ALLOWED Petition DISMISSED. Judge: Sullivan, Hon. Susan E | |
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Petitioner Emily Medina's Motion to dismiss all counts | |
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons and order of notice issued on a Petition for Immediate Release on Writ of Habeas Corpus, returnable on 06/18/2021 11:00 AM Hearing - Habeas Corpus. | |
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Determination regarding normal fees and costs ALLOWED FORTHWITH by Clerk waived in full , pursuant to G. L. c. 261, § 27C(2). Judge: Swanson, Dina | |
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Petitioner Emily Medina's Motion for an Expedited Hearing on Emergency Petition for Immediate Release on Writ of Habeas Corpus, Pursuant to G.L. CH. 248 and Art. I, X, XI and XII of the Massachusetts Declaration of Rights | |
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Antoinette L Hall, Esq. added for Plaintiff Emily Medina | |
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. | |
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Petitioner in Support of Emergency Petition for Immediate Release on Writ of Habeas Corpus | |
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Emergency Petition for Immediate Release on Writ of Habeas Corpus, Pursuant to G.L. CH> 248 and Art. 1, X, XI and XII of the Massachusetts Declaration of Rights electronically filed. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.