Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Martin, Debra L, Martin, Dustin J, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by O'Malley, Esq., Michael R, against Anderson, James R., represented by Hoffey, Jr., Esq., Thomas M, in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts with Debra A. Squires-Lee presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDebra A. Squires-Lee Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 08, 2021 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedOctober 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBristol County, MA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 06/08/2021
Date: June 08, 2021Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: June 08, 2021Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: June 08, 2021Complaint electronically filed.
Date: June 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT of Dismissal: Failure to comply with nisi order. Judge: Sullivan, Hon. Susan E | |
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER of dismissal nisi entered after action was reported settled; Agreement or Stipulation shall be filed in this court by 02/25/2022 Judge: Squires-Lee, Hon. Debra A | |
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Petition for Approval of Settlement Pursuant to G.L. Chapter 231 Section 140C 1/2 - Assented to (#8.1): ALLOWED after hearing. | |
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Hearing on Proposed Settlement scheduled on: 01/25/2022 02:00 PM Has been: Held as Scheduled Hon. Debra A Squires-Lee, Presiding Appeared: Plaintiff Dustin J. Martin Michael R O'Malley, Esq., Plaintiff Debra L. Martin Staff: Garrett Fregault, Assistant Clerk Magistrate 01/25/2022 02:00 PM Digital Recording Device Bris CV C, Court Reporter 01/25/2022 02:00 PM
Judge: Squires-Lee, Debra A |
|
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 12/03/2021 15:54:47 Notice Sent To: Michael R O'Malley, Esq. O'Malley-McAuley Law 4 Court St Suite 212, Plymouth, MA 02360 Notice Sent To: Thomas M Hoffey, Jr., Esq. Mazzocca and Associates 2000 West Park Drive Suite 100, Westborough, MA 01581 | |
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 12/03/2021 15:50:39 Notice Sent To: Michael R O'Malley, Esq. O'Malley-McAuley Law 4 Court St Suite 212, Plymouth, MA 02360 Notice Sent To: Thomas M Hoffey, Jr., Esq. Mazzocca and Associates 2000 West Park Drive Suite 100, Westborough, MA 01581 | |
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Amended: amended complaint filed by Dustin J. Martin, Debra L. Martin | |
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to amend the complaint (#8.0): ALLOWED by agreement. Amended complaint shall be docketed. Judge: Fregault, Garrett R | |
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition for Approval of Settlement agreement | |
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiffs Dustin J. Martin, Debra L. Martin's Motion to amend the original complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.