Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
New Bedford Management Systems, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Carpenter, Esq., Thomas P, against Estrella, Brianna, Harkins, Dorothy S., in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBristol County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Service Returned for Defendant Estrella, Brianna: Service made at last and usual;
Date: January 30, 2017Service Returned for Defendant Harkins, Dorothy S.: Service made in hand;
Date: January 30, 2017Original civil complaint filed.
Date: December 30, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Execution Issued: Execution Judgment Debtor: Harkins, Dorothy S. / Estrella, Brianna Judgment Creditor: New Bedford Management Systems, Inc. doing business as Hathaway Manor Extended Care Facility Terms of Execution: EXON Issuance Date: 09/28/2017 Judgment Total: 6,984.93 Post Judgment Int. Rate: .03 Post Judgment Int. Total: 19.47 Execution Subtotal: 7,004.40 Execution Total: 7,004.40 | |
September 28, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT entered on this date.: Default Judgment MRCP 55(b)1 By Clerk Presiding: Garrett R Fregault Judgment For: New Bedford Management Systems, Inc. Judgment Against: Dorothy S. Harkins Brianna Estrella Terms of Judgment: Interest Begins: 12/30/2016 Jdgmnt Date: 08/25/2017 Interest Rate: .12 Daily Interest Rate: .000329 Damages: Damage Amt: 6104.63 Filing Fees: 275.00 Costs Pd to Court: 20.00 Other Costs: 107.30 Judgment Total: 6,984.93 | |
September 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Request for execution Applies To: Carpenter, Esq., Thomas P (Attorney) on behalf of New Bedford Management Systems, Inc. doing business as Hathaway Manor Extended Care Facility (Plaintiff) | |
August 25, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT entered on this date.: Default Judgment MRCP 55(b)1 By Clerk Presiding: Garrett R Fregault Judgment For: New Bedford Management Systems, Inc. Judgment Against: Dorothy S. Harkins Brianna Estrella Terms of Judgment: Interest Begins: 12/30/2016 Jdgmnt Date: 08/25/2017 Interest Rate: .12 Daily Interest Rate: .000329 Damages: Damage Amt: 6104.63 Filing Fees: 275.00 Costs Pd to Court: 20.00 Other Costs: 107.30 Judgment Total: 6,984.93 | |
August 25, 2017 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Request for Default Judgment (#13.0): ALLOWED After review, Judgment to enter against the defendants in the amount of $6,104.63 plus statutory costs and interest. | |
August 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Affidavit filed by Plaintiff New Bedford Management Systems, Inc. doing business as Hathaway Manor Extended Care Facility in support of Request for Default Judgment | |
August 24, 2017 | Docket Event | New Bedford Management Systems, Inc. doing business as Hathaway Manor Extended Care Facility's request for Default JUDGMENT 55(b)(1) Applies To: Harkins, Dorothy S. (Defendant); Estrella, Brianna (Defendant) | |
August 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Default (1-88): Defendant Estrella, Brianna: Defaulted under time standards Applies To: Estrella, Brianna (Defendant) | |
May 15, 2017 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to Increase Attachment of Defendants' Real Estate (#9.0): ALLOWED without opposition from the defendants. | |
May 15, 2017 | Docket Event | Findings and Order for Approval of Plaintiff(s) New Bedford Management Systems, Inc. doing business as Hathaway Manor Extended Care Facility's Motion (#9.0) for a Real Estate Attachment as to Defendant Dorothy S. Harkins, Brianna Estrella in the amount of $66,310.00. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.