Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Monte, Brittney, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Sabra, Esq., Steven P, against Desrosiers, Dana W., represented by Mazzocca, Esq., Richard P, Merlino, Esq., Joseph A, in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts with Raffi N. Yessayan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRaffi N. Yessayan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2016 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedJuly 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBristol County, MA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Received from Defendant Desrosiers, Dana W.: Answer with claim for trial by jury;
Date: February 21, 2017Service Returned for Defendant Desrosiers, Dana W.: Service made in hand;
Date: February 06, 2017Original civil complaint filed.
Date: December 27, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with Prejudice, without Costs as to Brittney Monte's original complaint | |
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER of dismissal nisi entered after action was reported settled; Agreement or Stipulation shall be filed in this court by 04/04/2018 Judge: Yessayan, Hon. Raffi N
Judge: Yessayan, Raffi |
|
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event | General correspondence regarding file sent to Taunton | |
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Event Result: Judge: Yessayan, Hon. Raffi N The following event: Damage Assessment Hearing scheduled for 03/14/2018 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Canceled Reason: Case Settled
Judge: Yessayan, Raffi N |
|
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Document: A Order for Entry of Dismissal Nisi was generated and sent to: Attorney: Steven P Sabra, Esq. Attorney: Joseph A Merlino, Esq. Attorney: Richard P Mazzocca, Esq. | |
February 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit filed by Plaintiff Brittney Monte in support of Motion for Assessment of Damages | |
February 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Brittney Monte's Memorandum in support of Motion for Assessment of Damages | |
February 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Brittney Monte's Motion for Assessment of Damages | |
February 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT 33(a) for Plaintiff(s), Brittney Monte against Defendant(s), Dana W. Desrosiers on LIABILITY ONLY. Motion for assessment of damages must be filed by 03/05/2018 or the action will be dismissed. Judge: Yessayan, Hon. Raffi N
Judge: Yessayan, Raffi |
|
February 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Application for Entry of Final Judgment for Relief as to Defendant (#10.0): ALLOWED Application is allowed. Judgment on liability only to enter against defendant, Dana W. Desrosiers. Judge: Sullivan, Jennifer A
Judge: Jennifer ASullivan |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.