Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Webster Bank, National Association, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Hughes, Esq., Brian John, against Bank Of America, N.A., Consumer Product Distributors, Inc., Crosson, Richard A., Department Of Treasury-Internal Revenue Service, Mutual Oil Co., Inc., (total of 5) See All represented by Davis, Esq., Patricia A, Stanford, Esq., Roger C, in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts with Raffi N. Yessayan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRaffi N. Yessayan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2016 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBristol County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Defendant Bank of America, N.A. Successor to Fleet National Bank's Motion to Release Funds
Date: December 15, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion to Release Funds (#15.0): ALLOWED Motion Allowed. Judge: Yessayan, Hon. Raffi N
Judge: Yessayan, Raffi |
|
December 15, 2017 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance with Superior Court Rule 9A Applies To: Davis, Esq., Patricia A (Attorney) on behalf of Bank of America, N.A. Successor to Fleet National Bank (Defendant) | |
December 15, 2017 | Docket Event | Defendant Bank of America, N.A. Successor to Fleet National Bank's Motion to Release Funds | |
October 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion to Release Funds (#14.0): No Action Taken as the motion was not served pursuant to Superior Court Rule 9A. Judge: Fregault, Garrett R
Judge: Garrett RFregault |
|
October 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Norma Marie Morua | |
October 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Defendant Bank of America, N.A. Successor to Fleet National Bank's Motion to Release Funds | |
October 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Party status: Plaintiff Webster Bank, National Association Successor in interest to First Federal Savings Bank of America: Withdrawn; | |
October 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Order for Escrow Deposit | |
September 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Financial Note: check# 4489 received in the amount of $45,069.47 from Brennan, Recupero, Cascione, Scungio & McAllister LLP | |
August 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for Leave to Pay Funds Into Court and to Discharge Plaintiff or in the Alternative for Instructions (#12.0): ALLOWED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.