Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Brown, Eric, Monette, Elizabeth, Monette, Jr., Stephen, Monette, Rebecca, filed a(n) General Securities - Securities case represented by Rogers, Esq., Rebecca N, Smith-Lee, Esq., Emily E, against Keegan, Brendan, Kouchalakos, Evan, Mitchell, James, represented by Burgess, Esq., David J, in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 16, 2016 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedJuly 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaSecurities |
Filing LocationBristol County, MA |
Matter TypeGeneral Securities |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with Prejudice, without Costs as to Stephen Monette, Jr., Rebecca Monette, Elizabeth Monette, Eric Brown's original complaint and with all parties having waived all rights of appeal. | |
January 30, 2017 | Docket Event | Summons, returned SERVED David Burgess, Esq. accepted service of the Summons, Complaint, Statement of Money Damages, Civil Action Cover Sheet and Civil Tracking Order on behalf of Defendants, Brenden Keegan, Evan Kouchalakos and James Mitchell, on January 12, 2017 Applies To: Keegan, Brendan (Defendant); Mitchell, James (Defendant); Kouchalakos, Evan (Defendant) | |
January 19, 2017 | Docket Event | Received from Defendant Keegan, Brendan, James Mitchell and Evan Kouchalakos Answer with claim for trial by jury; | |
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event | One Trial case reviewed by Clerk, case to remain in the Superior Court. | |
December 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Original civil complaint filed. | |
December 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Demand for jury trial entered. | |
December 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. | |
December 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Case assigned to: DCM Track A - Average was added on 12/16/2016 | |
December 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Rebecca N. Rogers, Esq. added for Plaintiff Eric Brown | |
December 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Emily E. Smith-Lee, Esq. added for Plaintiff Eric Brown |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.