Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Jennings, Darlene, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Cunha, Esq., Brian R, against Perry, Donald, Perry, Geraldine, represented by Feeney, Esq., Robert F, Haverty, Esq., John W, in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 16, 2016 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBristol County, MA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with Prejudice, without Costs as to Darlene Jennings's original complaint and all rights of appeal waived. | |
June 07, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER issued on application/motion (#9.0) to allow Robert F Feeney, Esq.Donald Perry to inspect hospital records regarding Darlene Jennings (DOB 08/26/1958) from Charlton Memorial Hospital - A campus of Southcoast Hospitals Group. | |
June 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for Medical Records of SCHG Charlton Memorial Hospital (#9.0): ALLOWED Refer to ORDER. | |
May 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Defendant Donald Perry, Geraldine Perry's Motion for medical records of Schg Charlton Memorial Hospital for the plaintiff, Darlene Jennings. | |
May 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance with Superior Court Rule 9A Applies To: Feeney, Esq., Robert F (Attorney) on behalf of Perry, Geraldine (Defendant) | |
April 27, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER: for medical records from Saint Anne's Hospital | |
April 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance with Superior Court Rule 9A Applies To: Feeney, Esq., Robert F (Attorney) on behalf of Perry, Donald, Perry, Geraldine (Defendant) | |
April 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Defendant Donald Perry, Geraldine Perry's Motion for Medical Records of Saint Anne's Hospital for the Plaintiff Darlene Jennings | |
February 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Received from Defendant Perry, Geraldine: Answer with claim for trial by jury; | |
February 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date John W Haverty, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Defendant Geraldine Perry |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.