Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Millet, Jason, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Smith, Esq., Gregory T, against Derosa, Brianna, Nguyen, Diep, represented by Tierney, Esq., Philip T, in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts with Thomas J. Perrino presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas J. Perrino Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 14, 2016 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBristol County, MA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with Prejudice, without Costs as to Jason Millet's original complaint All rights of appeal waived. | |
October 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Document: A Order for Entry of Dismissal Nisi was generated and sent to: Attorney: Gregory T Smith, Esq. Attorney: Philip T Tierney, Esq. | |
October 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER of dismissal nisi entered after action was reported settled; Agreement or Stipulation shall be filed in this court by 11/05/2018 Judge: Perrino, Thomas J
Judge: Thomas JPerrino |
|
October 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Jury Trial scheduled on: 10/15/2018 09:00 AM Has been: Canceled For the following reason: Case Settled Judge: Perrino, Thomas J
Judge: Thomas JPerrino |
|
October 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Final Trial Conference scheduled on: 10/11/2018 02:00 PM Has been: Canceled For the following reason: Case Settled Judge: Perrino, Thomas J
Judge: Thomas JPerrino |
|
April 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial ORDER: Trial with jury 3 1/2 days scheduled for 10/15/18. One week in advance of trial: 10/5/18 All motions in limine to be filed Requests for jury instructions Proposed verdict slips Final Trial Conference Date 10/11/18 at 2 pm. Judge: Fregault, Garrett R
Judge: Garrett RFregault |
|
April 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Event Result: Judge: Fregault, Garrett R The following event: Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 04/23/2018 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Held as Scheduled
Judge: Garrett R The following event: Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 04/23/2018 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Held as ScheduledFregault |
|
April 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Joint Pre-Trial Memorandum filed: | |
January 10, 2018 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Final Pre-Trial Conference Sent On: 01/10/2018 11:29:54 | |
March 29, 2017 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to Consolidate this case with Bristol Superior Docket #16CV1177 Jason Millet V. Brianna DeRosa et al (#18.0): ALLOWED after review, no opposition having been filed Copied from linked case: 1673CV00257 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.