Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Kimwell Healthcare, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Crotty, Esq., Thomas P, against Willever, Coservator Of Arthur Silvia, Nina White, represented by Willever, Esq., Nina Stuart White, in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 12, 2016 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBristol County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Plaintiff Kimwell Healthcare, LLC's Certificate of Service as to Trustee Summons
Date: January 09, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2017 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with Prejudice, without Costs as to Kimwell Healthcare, LLC's original complaint | |
January 09, 2017 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Kimwell Healthcare, LLC's Certificate of Service as to Trustee Summons | |
December 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Received from Defendant and Trustee Defendant: Answer to original complaint Applies To: Willever, Coservator of Arthur Silvia, Nina White (Defendant); Willever, Nina White (Trustee Defendant) | |
December 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Nina Stuart White Willever, Esq. added as Self Represented for Defendant Nina White Willever, Coservator of Arthur Silvia | |
December 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Summons and Order of Notice #4 Service Returned for Defendant Willever, Coservator of Arthur Silvia, Nina White: Service made in hand; | |
December 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for Trustee Process (#3.0): ALLOWED after hearing at which the Trustee Defendant did not appear, however counsel for the plaintiff reported to the Court that she has no objection, motion is ALLOWED | |
December 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Findings and Order for Approval of Plaintiff(s) Kimwell Healthcare, LLC's Motion (#3.0) for Trustee Process as to Defendant(s) Nina White Willever, Coservator of Arthur Silvia | |
December 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Hearing on Trustee Process scheduled for 12/19/2016 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Held as Scheduled | |
December 13, 2016 | Docket Event | One Trial case reviewed by Clerk, case to remain in the Superior Court. | |
December 12, 2016 | Docket Event | Plaintiff(s) Kimwell Healthcare, LLC's EX PARTE Motion for Trustee Process |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.