Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Chace, Nichole, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Clapp, Esq., Stephen D, against Stern, M.D., Leslie E., represented by Ilacqua, Esq., Matthew James, Keane, Esq., Paul R, in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 07, 2016 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedNovember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBristol County, MA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Rule 12 Hearing scheduled for 07/27/2017 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Canceled Reason: Case Disposed Copied from linked case: 1373CV00318 | |
May 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Rule 12 Hearing scheduled for 07/27/2017 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Canceled Reason: Case Settled | |
May 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of voluntary dismissal (41a.l.i) | |
May 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Amended: amended complaint filed by Nichole Chace, Personal Representative Copied from linked case: 1373CV00318 | |
April 28, 2017 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 04/28/2017 12:31:06 | |
April 28, 2017 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 04/28/2017 12:32:01 Copied from linked case: 1373CV00318 | |
April 25, 2017 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to Consolidate and Amend the Complaint (#40.0): ALLOWED Future filings shall be made in C.A. #1373CV00318. copied from linked case 1373CV00318 | |
April 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Notice of intent to file motion to consolidate pursuant to Superior Court Rule 31 with 1373CV00318 Applies To: Clapp, Esq., Stephen D (Attorney) on behalf of Nichole Chace Personal Representative for the Estate of Patricia D. Chace (Plaintiff) | |
April 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Opposition to to Motion to Dismiss filed by Nichole Chace Personal Representative for the Estate of Patricia D. Chace | |
April 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance with Superior Court Rule 9A Applies To: Ilacqua, Esq., Matthew James (Attorney) on behalf of Stern, M.D., Leslie E. (Defendant) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.