Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Mcclanahan, Michael, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Feeney, Esq., Robert F, Haverty, Esq., John W, Monaco, Esq., Peter, against Home Depot Usa, Inc., represented by Kincaid, Esq., Kelly A, Martin Malone, Esq., Kelly, in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts with Raffi N. Yessayan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRaffi N. Yessayan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 05, 2016 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedJuly 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBristol County, MA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with Prejudice, without Costs as to Michael McClanahan's original complaint | |
March 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Document: A Order for Entry of Dismissal Nisi was generated and sent to: Attorney: Robert F Feeney, Esq. Attorney: John W Haverty, Esq. Attorney: Peter Monaco, Esq. Attorney: Kelly Martin Malone, Esq. Attorney: Kelly A Kincaid, Esq. | |
March 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER of dismissal nisi entered after action was reported settled; Agreement or Stipulation shall be filed in this court by 04/25/2018 Judge: Yessayan, Hon. Raffi N
Judge: Yessayan, Raffi |
|
March 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial ORDER: case settled, closing papers to be filed by April 25, 2018 Judge: Yessayan, Hon. Raffi N
Judge: Yessayan, Raffi |
|
December 20, 2017 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Final Pre-Trial Conference Sent On: 12/20/2017 11:38:23 | |
July 27, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER issued on application/motion (#9.0) to allow Kelly A Kincaid, Esq.Home Depot USA, Inc. to inspect hospital records regarding Michael McClanahan from SMG Specialty Care. | |
July 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Application for Order to Inspect Hospital Records of Plaintiff (#9.0): ALLOWED No opposition having been filed, motion is allowed. | |
July 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Defendant Home Depot USA, Inc.'s Application for Order to inspect Hospital Records of Plaintiff from SMG Specialty Care | |
June 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Stipulation and Protective Order (#8.0): ALLOWED The parties having stipulated and agreed hereto, it is SO ORDERED. | |
May 30, 2017 | Docket Event | Party(s) file Stipulation and Protective Order Applies To: Haverty, Esq., John W (Attorney) on behalf of McClanahan, Michael (Plaintiff); Martin Malone, Esq., Kelly (Attorney) on behalf of Home Depot USA, Inc. (Defendant) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.