Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
St. Anne'S Credit Union Of Fall River, Mass., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Saulino, Esq., Peter A, against Buckley, Michael F., Savoie, David T., Savoie, Megan B., The Estate Of Dayle R. Buckley, in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2015 |
CategoryReal Property |
Last RefreshedApril 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBristol County, MA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Original civil complaint filed.
Date: December 31, 2015Notice of voluntary dismissal (41a.l.i)
Date: March 01, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of voluntary dismissal (41a.l.i) | |
January 06, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER of notice by publication of foreclosure ORDER of notice by publication of foreclosure in Fall River Herald News returnable February 16, 2016 | |
December 31, 2015 | Docket Event | Original civil complaint filed. | |
December 31, 2015 | Docket Event | Mortgagee's Affidavit notice sent | |
December 31, 2015 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. | |
December 31, 2015 | Docket Event | Case assigned to: DCM Track X - Accelerated was added on 12/31/2015 | |
December 31, 2015 | Docket Event | Appearance entered On this date Peter A. Saulino, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Plaintiff St. Anne's Credit Union of Fall River, Mass. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.