Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Mello, Claudia, Mello, Francis, Mello, Robert, filed a(n) Zoning - Property case represented by Badwey, Esq., Louis M, Peirce, Esq., Richard M, against Choubah, Halim, Figueiredo, Jacqueline, Gardner, Robert, J.B. Lanagan & Company, Inc., represented by Cruise, Esq., Brian James, Mulford, Iii, Esq., Ralph K, Savastano, Esq., Anthony C, in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2015 |
CategoryReal Property |
Last RefreshedJuly 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBristol County, MA |
Matter TypeZoning |
ORDER: Consent on Joint motion for Bifurcation and Partial Stay
Date: August 26, 2016ORDER: Consent Order
Date: July 20, 2016Service Returned for Defendant J.B. Lanagan & Company, Inc.: Service via certified mail;
Date: January 29, 2016Original civil complaint filed.
Date: December 31, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with Prejudice, without Costs as to Claudia Mello, Francis Mello Also Known As Frank Mello, Robert Mello's original complaint | |
October 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to extend tracking deadline(s) (#10.0): ALLOWED by Agreement. A new Tracking Order shall issue entering all deadlines as requested. | |
October 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Plaintiffs Claudia Mello, Francis Mello Also Known As Frank Mello, Robert Mello's Joint Motion to extend tracking deadline(s) | |
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER: Consent on Joint motion for Bifurcation and Partial Stay | |
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for Bifurcation and partial Stay (#8.0): ALLOWED Because the motion is by agreement, it is Allowed by this Judge | |
August 24, 2016 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Ralph K Mulford, III, Esq. added as Special Appearance for Defendant J.B. Lanagan & Company, Inc. | |
August 24, 2016 | Docket Event | Plaintiffs Claudia Mello, Francis Mello Also Known As Frank Mello, Robert Mello's Response to Defendants' Motion to Bifurcate and Partial Stay | |
August 24, 2016 | Docket Event | J.B. Lanagan & Company, Inc., Jacqueline Figueiredo member of Dartmouth Zoning Board of Appeals, Halim Choubah member of Dartmouth Zoning Board of Appeals, Robert Gardner member of Dartmouth Zoning Board of Appeals's Memorandum in support of Motion for Bifurcation and Partial Stay | |
August 24, 2016 | Docket Event | Defendants J.B. Lanagan & Company, Inc., Jacqueline Figueiredo member of Dartmouth Zoning Board of Appeals, Halim Choubah member of Dartmouth Zoning Board of Appeals, Robert Gardner member of Dartmouth Zoning Board of Appeals's Joint Motion for Bifurcation and Partial Stay | |
July 20, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER: Consent Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.