Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Webster Bank , National Association, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Albano, Esq., Jonathan M, George, Esq., Wayne E, against Brisson, Richard P, Falzarano, Philip C, Pharmahealth Hawthorne, Inc, Pharmahealth Real Estate Llc, Pharmahealth Specialty, Inc., (total of 7) See All represented by Markey Jr, John A, Tanner, Esq., Mark Allan, in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts with Sharon E. Donatelle presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSharon E. Donatelle Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2015 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedNovember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBristol County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Notice of final report and consented to motion for approval of and authority to pay professional, wind-down, and other expenses (#28.0): ALLOWED After careful review of the motion and exhibits and with the assent of all the interested parties, the motion is ALLOWED Judge: Donatelle, Hon. Sharon
Judge: Donatelle, Sharon |
|
September 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER: Consent Order Regarding Special Examiner's Final Report and Consented to Motion for Approval of and Authority to pay Professional, Wind-down, and Other Expenses of Defendant Pharmahealth Hawthorne, Inc. a/k/a Pharmahealth Hawthorn, Inc Judge: Donatelle, Hon. Sharon
Judge: Donatelle, Sharon |
|
September 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Other Interested Party Joseph M DiOrio, Esq.'s Notice of Final Report and Consented to Motion for Approval of and Authority to pay Professional, Wind-down, and other Expenses | |
July 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER: ORDER AUTHORIZING AND APPROVING (I) SALE OF CERTAIN ASSETS OF PHARMAHEALTH HAWTHORNE, INC. FREE AND CLEAR OF LIENS, CLAIMS, AND ENCUMBERANCES; AND (II) ASSIGNMENT OF UNEXPIRED LEASE: Judge: Donatelle, Hon. Sharon
Judge: Donatelle, Sharon |
|
July 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Status Review scheduled on: 07/11/2018 10:00 AM Has been: Held as Scheduled Hon. Sharon Donatelle, Presiding Appeared: Staff: John Losowski, Assistant Clerk Magistrate Digital Recording Device Bris CV C, Court Reporter 07/11/2018 10:00 AM
Judge: Donatelle, Sharon |
|
July 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion to approve compromise of Commonwealth of Massachusetts Office of Medicaid Claims (#24.0): ALLOWED having been assented to and having complied with Superior Court Rule 9A Judge: Losowski, John F
Judge: John FLosowski |
|
July 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Wayne E George, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Plaintiff Webster Bank , National Association | |
June 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Non-Party / Case Participant Joseph M DiOrio, Esq.'s Notice of Hearing and Invitation for Competing Bids (Assets of PharmaHealth Hawthorne, Inc. a/k/a PharmaHealth Hawthorne, Inc); Certificate of Service | |
June 28, 2018 | Docket Event | General correspondence regarding Assent, of Webster Bank, National Association, to Special Examiner's Motion to Approve Compromise of Commonwealth of Massachusetts Office of Medicaid Claims | |
June 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Non-Party / Case Participant Joseph M DiOrio, Esq.'s Motion to Approve Compromise of Commonwealth of Massachusetts Office of Medicaid Claims |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.