Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Godfrey, Paul, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Sousa, Esq., Gerald W, against Adams, Suzanne, Adams, James, represented by Broadmeadow, Esq., Kelsey, in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 03, 2016 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedApril 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBristol County, MA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with Prejudice, without Costs as to James Adams, Suzanne Adams's original complaint | |
May 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Kelsey Broadmeadow, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Defendant Suzanne Adams | |
April 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Aimee Walsh Wensus, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Defendant Suzanne Adams | |
April 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Aimee Walsh Wensus, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Defendant James Adams | |
April 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Received from Defendants: Answer with claim for trial by jury; Applies To: Adams, James (Defendant); Adams, Suzanne (Defendant) | |
February 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Summons, returned SERVED Applies To: Adams, Suzanne (Defendant) | |
February 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Summons, returned SERVED Applies To: Adams, James (Defendant) | |
February 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Adams, Suzanne: Service made by Registry of Motor Vehicles; | |
February 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Adams, James: Service made by Registry of Motor Vehicles; | |
December 23, 2015 | Docket Event | One Trial case reviewed by Clerk, case to remain in the Superior Court. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.