Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Sir Isaac Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Rosenberg, Esq., Nicholas, against Mosquito Shield Franchise Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2016 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedApril 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBristol County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Hearing on Motion for Attachment scheduled for 02/16/2016 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Canceled Reason: Case Settled | |
February 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Judgment: Dismissal MRCP 41(a)(1)(i) for Plaintiff(s) Sir Isaac LLC as to Defendant(s) Mosquito Shield Franchise Corporation, without prejudice. | |
January 06, 2016 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 01/06/2016 08:13:14 | |
January 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Hearing on Motion for Attachment scheduled for 01/13/2016 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Rescheduled Reason: Joint request of parties | |
December 29, 2015 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 12/29/2015 09:09:38 | |
December 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Hearing on Motion for Attachment scheduled for 12/29/2015 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Rescheduled Reason: Joint request of parties | |
December 18, 2015 | Docket Event | One Trial case reviewed by Clerk, case to remain in the Superior Court. | |
December 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for Short Order of Notice (#4.0): ALLOWED Summons and Order of Notice to issue returnable on Tuesday, December 29, 2015 at 2pm in the "B" session. | |
December 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Plaintiff(s) Sir Isaac LLC's MOTION for Short Order of Notice Applies To: Mosquito Shield Franchise Corporation (Defendant) | |
December 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Ross Dobson |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.