Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Construction Equipment Rentals, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Moniz, Esq., Rene Potkay, Weeks, Esq., Randall T, against Metal Building Services, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 15, 2015 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBristol County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Original civil complaint filed.
Date: December 15, 2015Finding on Assessment of Damages
Date: May 04, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Execution Issued: Execution Judgment Debtor: Metal Building Services, Inc. Judgment Creditor: Construction Equipment Rentals, Inc. Terms of Execution: EXON Issuance Date: 06/13/2016 Judgment Total: 32,107.71 Post Judgment Int. Rate: .012 Post Judgment Int. Total: 41.32 Execution Subtotal: 32,149.03 Execution Total: 32,149.03 | |
June 13, 2016 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT entered on this date. Default Judgment MRCP 55(b)2 After Hearing Moses, Hon. Richard T Judgment For: Construction Equipment Rentals, Inc. Judgment Against: Metal Building Services, Inc. Terms of Judgment: Interest Begins: 05/05/2016 Jdgmnt Date: 05/05/2016 Interest Rate: .12 Daily Interest Rate: .000329 Damages: Damage Amt: 27769.39 Filing Fees: 275.00 Costs Pd to Court: 5.00 Other Costs: 63.32 Crt Ord Atty Fee: 3995.00 Judgment Total: 32,107.71 Execution entered on 06/13/2016 | |
June 09, 2016 | Docket Event | Request for execution Applies To: Construction Equipment Rentals, Inc. (Plaintiff) | |
May 05, 2016 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT entered on this date. Default Judgment MRCP 55(b)2 After Hearing Moses, Hon. Richard T Judgment For: Construction Equipment Rentals, Inc. Judgment Against: Metal Building Services, Inc. Terms of Judgment: Interest Begins: 05/05/2016 Jdgmnt Date: 05/05/2016 Interest Rate: .12 Daily Interest Rate: .000329 Damages: Damage Amt: 27769.39 Filing Fees: 275.00 Costs Pd to Court: 5.00 Other Costs: 63.32 Crt Ord Atty Fee: 3995.00 Judgment Total: 32,107.71 | |
May 04, 2016 | Docket Event | Finding on Assessment of Damages | |
May 04, 2016 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Damage Assessment Hearing scheduled for 05/04/2016 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Held as Scheduled | |
April 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Construction Equipment Rentals, Inc.'s Notice of Damage Assessment Hearing | |
April 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Request for hearing filed Applies To: Construction Equipment Rentals, Inc. (Plaintiff) | |
April 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Construction Equipment Rentals, Inc.'s Motion for Costs and Attorneys' Fees | |
April 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Construction Equipment Rentals, Inc.'s request for Default JUDGMENT 55(b)(1) Applies To: Metal Building Services, Inc. (Defendant) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.