Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Silva, Paul, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Waxler, Esq., Jeremy R, against St. Amand, Jeannette, St. Amand, Robert, represented by Enright, Esq., Cheryl Ann, in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2015 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedNovember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBristol County, MA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Received from Defendant St. Amand, Jeannette: Answer with claim for trial by jury;
Date: February 24, 2016Service Returned for Defendant St. Amand, Robert: Service made in hand;
Date: January 13, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 05, 2017 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with Prejudice, without Costs as to Robert St. Amand, Jeannette St. Amand's original complaint and all rights of appeal waived | |
April 05, 2017 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 04/10/2017 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Not Held Reason: Case Settled | |
February 22, 2017 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Final Pre-Trial Conference Sent On: 02/22/2017 11:15:58 | |
February 24, 2016 | Docket Event | Received from Defendant St. Amand, Jeannette: Answer with claim for trial by jury; | |
February 24, 2016 | Docket Event | Appearance entered On this date Cheryl Ann Enright, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Defendant Jeannette St. Amand | |
February 24, 2016 | Docket Event | Appearance entered On this date Cheryl Ann Enright, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Defendant Robert St. Amand | |
January 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant St. Amand, Robert: Service made in hand; | |
January 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant St. Amand, Jeannette: Service made at last and usual; | |
December 17, 2015 | Docket Event | One Trial case reviewed by Clerk, case to remain in the Superior Court. | |
December 14, 2015 | Docket Event | Original civil complaint filed. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.