Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Warden, Marjorie C., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Correira, Esq., David J, Correira, Esq., Eric D, against Home For Aged People In Fall River, represented by La Terra Bellina, Esq., Giovanni, Orson, Esq., Theodore, in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2015 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBristol County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Original civil complaint filed.
Date: December 14, 2015Agreement for Judgment:
Date: February 21, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Execution returned: satisfied (#10) | |
March 09, 2017 | Docket Event | Execution issued on the judgment dated 02/21/2017, (#9.0) against the following party(s): Home for Aged People in Fall River in favor of Marjorie C. Warden. In the amount of 70,000.00. | |
March 07, 2017 | Docket Event | General correspondence regarding case sent to FR. | |
February 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Agreement for Judgment: | |
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event | General correspondence regarding Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Verified Complaint | |
January 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Appearance entered On this date Theodore Orson, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Defendant Home for Aged People in Fall River | |
January 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Appearance entered On this date Giovanni La Terra Bellina, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Defendant Home for Aged People in Fall River | |
December 24, 2015 | Docket Event | (Summons and Order of Notice #5) Service Returned for Defendant Home for Aged People in Fall River: Service through person in charge / agent; | |
December 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for Plaintiff's motion for approval of attachment of real property (#3.0): ALLOWED After hearing and review of a photocopy of the return of service by Bristol Deputy Sheriff William Mello, Jr. (attached to this pleading), this motion is ALLOWED and an attachment is to enter in an amount of $188,500.00 as to real estate standing in the name of the Defendant located @ 1168 Highland Avenue and 4380 North Main Street, Fall River MA 02720 Applies To: Correira, Esq., David J (Attorney) on behalf of Warden, Marjorie C (Plaintiff); Correira, Esq., Eric D. (Attorney) on behalf of Warden, Marjorie C (Plaintiff) | |
December 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Findings and Order for Approval of Plaintiff(s) Marjorie C Warden's Motion (#3.0) for a Real Estate Attachment as to Defendant(s) Home for Aged People in Fall River After hearing and a review of a photocopy of return of service upon the Defendant (attached hereto), this motion is ALLOWED and a real estate attachment is to enter in an amount of $188,500.00 as to real estate standing in the name of the Defendant. Applies To: Home for Aged People in Fall River (Defendant); Correira, Esq., David J (Attorney) on behalf of Warden, Marjorie C (Plaintiff) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.