Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Capello, Peter, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Resmini, Esq., Andrew, against Pedini, Ashley, represented by Galas, Jr., Esq., Walter A, in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 11, 2015 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedJuly 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBristol County, MA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Original civil complaint filed.
Date: December 11, 2015Received from Defendant Pedini, Ashley: Answer with claim for trial by jury;
Date: January 04, 2016Service Returned for Defendant Pedini, Ashley: Service made at last and usual;
Date: December 18, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 24, 2016 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with Prejudice, without Costs as to Ashley Pedini's original complaint | |
January 04, 2016 | Docket Event | Received from Defendant Pedini, Ashley: Answer with claim for trial by jury; | |
January 04, 2016 | Docket Event | Appearance entered On this date Walter A. Galas, Jr., Esq. added as Private Counsel for Defendant Ashley Pedini | |
December 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Pedini, Ashley: Service made at last and usual; | |
December 11, 2015 | Docket Event | Original civil complaint filed. | |
December 11, 2015 | Docket Event | One Trial case reviewed by Clerk, case to remain in the Superior Court. | |
December 11, 2015 | Docket Event | Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 12/11/2015 | |
December 11, 2015 | Docket Event | Appearance entered On this date Andrew Resmini, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Plaintiff Peter Capello | |
December 11, 2015 | Docket Event | Demand for jury trial entered. | |
December 11, 2015 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.