Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Haela, Ezra, filed a(n) Equitable Remedies case represented by Pro Se, against Nationstar Mortgage, Llc, represented by Walsh, Esq., Thomas J, in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts with Raffi N. Yessayan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRaffi N. Yessayan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 04, 2015 |
CategoryEquitable Remedies |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBristol County, MA |
|
Plaintiff Ezra Haela's Motion to Settle
Date: December 04, 2020Defendant NationStar Mortgage, LLC's Statement of material facts
Date: May 26, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Ezra Haela | |
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 06/11/2021 14:52:45 Notice Sent To: Ezra Haela 424 Winthrop St., Taunton, MA 02780 | |
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 06/08/2021 10:40:35 Notice Sent To: Thomas J Walsh, Esq. Harmon Law Offices, P.C. 150 California St, Newton, MA 02458 Notice Sent To: Ezra Haela 424 Winthrop St., Taunton, MA 02780 | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant NationStar Mortgage, LLC's Statement of material facts | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | NationStar Mortgage, LLC's Memorandum in support of Motion for Summary Judgment | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance with Superior Court Rule 9A Applies To: Walsh, Esq., Thomas J (Attorney) on behalf of NationStar Mortgage, LLC (Defendant) | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Fay Janati | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit that Plaintiff Ezra Haela is not in the Military | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Compliance Superior Court Rule 9C Applies To: NationStar Mortgage, LLC (Defendant) | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant NationStar Mortgage, LLC's Motion for summary judgment, MRCP 56 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.