Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Williams, Aaron E, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Matthews, Esq., Patrick T, Tavares, Esq., Brian Manuel, against Deluga, Ronald, represented by Mutter, Esq., Michael I, in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts with Elaine M. Buckley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElaine M. Buckley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 03, 2015 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedJuly 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBristol County, MA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with Prejudice, without Costs as to Aaron E Williams's original complaint | |
June 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER of dismissal nisi entered after action was reported settled; Agreement or Stipulation shall be filed in this court by 08/24/2018 Judge: Buckley, Hon. Elaine M
Judge: Buckley, Elaine |
|
June 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Jury Trial scheduled on: 09/24/2018 09:00 AM Has been: Canceled For the following reason: Case Settled Hon. Renee P Dupuis, Presiding Judge: Dupuis, Hon. Renee P
Judge: Dupuis, ReneeDupuis, Renee P |
|
June 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Final Trial Conference scheduled on: 09/20/2018 02:00 PM Has been: Canceled For the following reason: Case Settled Hon. Renee P Dupuis, Presiding Judge: Dupuis, Hon. Renee P
Judge: Dupuis, ReneeDupuis, Renee P |
|
June 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Conference to Review Status scheduled on: 06/25/2018 02:00 PM Has been: Canceled For the following reason: Case Settled Hon. Elaine M Buckley, Presiding Judge: Buckley, Hon. Elaine M
Judge: Buckley, ElaineBuckley, Elaine M |
|
June 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Document: A Order for Entry of Dismissal Nisi was generated and sent to: Attorney: Patrick T Matthews, Esq. Attorney: Brian Manuel Tavares, Esq. Attorney: Michael I Mutter, Esq. | |
March 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Event Result: Judge: Leighton, Hon. Joseph The following event: Jury Trial scheduled for 03/05/2018 09:00 AM has been resulted as follows: Result: Rescheduled Reason: Joint request of parties
Judge: Leighton, Joseph |
|
March 02, 2018 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 03/02/2018 09:42:28 | |
March 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion to continue / reschedule an event Trial (#12.0): ALLOWED after hearing, but with the following dates; Status Review on June 25, 2018, Final Trial Conference on Sept. 20, 2018 and Trial on Sept. 24, 2018. Judge: Leighton, Hon. Joseph
Judge: Leighton, Joseph |
|
March 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Event Result: Judge: Leighton, Hon. Joseph The following event: Final Trial Conference scheduled for 03/01/2018 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Not Held Reason: Converted to status conference Staff Appeared: Court Reporter Digital Recording Device Bris CV B Assistant Clerk Magistrate Fregault, Garrett
Judge: Leighton, Joseph |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.