Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
60 Cross Street, Llc, Martignetti Companies, Inc., filed a(n) Equitable Remedies case represented by Gay, Esq., David Thomas, against City Of Taunton, represented by Buffington, Esq., Jason D, De Abreu, Esq., Daniel Francis, in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 02, 2015 |
CategoryEquitable Remedies |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBristol County, MA |
|
Agreement for Judgment:
Date: December 16, 2016Received from Defendant City of Taunton: Answer to original complaint;
Date: December 24, 2015Service Returned for Defendant City of Taunton: Service through person in charge / agent;
Date: December 09, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Execution issued on the judgment dated 12/16/2016, (#7.0) against the following party(s): City of Taunton in favor of Martignetti Companies, Inc., 60 Cross Street, LLC. In the amount of $160,220.58. | |
December 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Agreement for Judgment: | |
December 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Received from Defendant City of Taunton: Answer to original complaint; | |
December 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Appearance entered On this date Jason D. Buffington, Esq. and Daniel Francis de Abreu, Esq. added as City / Town Counsel for Defendant City of Taunton | |
December 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant City of Taunton: Service through person in charge / agent; | |
December 04, 2015 | Docket Event | One Trial case reviewed by Clerk, case to remain in the Superior Court. | |
December 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Original civil complaint filed. | |
December 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Appearance entered On this date David Thomas Gay, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Plaintiff 60 Cross Street, LLC | |
December 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. | |
December 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Case assigned to: DCM Track A - Average was added on 12/02/2015 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.